LA HB839 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for election sections for the Juvenile Court for the Parish of Jefferson

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for election sections for the Juvenile Court for the Parish of Jefferson

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 839 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2018-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-26HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB839&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082225
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087447
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088538
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090885
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090854
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086730
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087378
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087813
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087877
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090817
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090795
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082226
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087584
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090881
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090827

Bill Comments

feedback