LA HB836 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 06/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to waiver of certain dental licensing requirements during a declared state of emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to waiver of certain dental licensing requirements during a declared state of emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 836 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#733) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 836 FINAL PASSAGE (#579) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 836 FINAL PASSAGE (#366) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12HouseEffective date: 06/12/2020.
2020-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 331.
2020-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB836&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168210
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174048
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178542
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182525
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176463
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178476
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168213
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174102
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176517
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175479
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177696

Bill Comments

feedback