LA HB835 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes local hospital assessments in certain parishes to fund the nonfederal share of Medicaid costs of health care provided in those parishes (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes local hospital assessments in certain parishes to fund the nonfederal share of Medicaid costs of health care provided in those parishes (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 835 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#732) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#550) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#550) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 330. |
2020-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |