LA HB829 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to alcoholic beverage delivery
Title
Provides relative to alcoholic beverage delivery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 829 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1555) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 829 FINAL PASSAGE (#1241) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 829 FINAL PASSAGE (#349) (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 829 FINAL PASSAGE (#1241) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 829 FINAL PASSAGE (#349) (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 514. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 6, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0-1). |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |