LA HB823 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Greenwell Springs-Airline Economic Development District in East Baton Rouge Parish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Greenwell Springs-Airline Economic Development District in East Baton Rouge Parish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 823 ADOPT (#1094) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 823 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1085) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 823 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#990) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 823 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 823 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 433.
2015-06-15HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
2015-06-11HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-11HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-11SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2015-06-11SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-11HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2015-06-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015.
2015-06-10HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2015-06-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Barrow, Badon, and James.
2015-06-10SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2015-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Dorsey-Colomb, Broome, and White.
2015-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2015-06-09SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2015-06-09HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2015-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
2015-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-06-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-06-04SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-06-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-05-28SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015.
2015-05-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-18HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2015-04-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-04-22HouseRead by title.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB823&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940980
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948541
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952658
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959118
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960504
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948313
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948398
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950512
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952507
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956226
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957001
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=940981
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948593
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952771
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958593
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962745
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962931
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952545
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956529
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958968
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959076

Bill Comments

feedback