LA HB82 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the authority of the commissioner of insurance to retain funds collected from certain fees
Title
Repeals the authority of the commissioner of insurance to retain funds collected from certain fees
Sponsors
Rep. John Illg [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 82 FINAL PASSAGE (#499) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 82 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 82 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 27. |
2022-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |