LA HB82 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read by title, amended, by a vote of 59 yeas, 33 nays, the bill was recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Oct 20 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits a school from sharing a student's personally identifiable information relative to illness or disease with the Dept. of Health for purposes of the Sanitary Code or any other purpose without parental consent (Item #42)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits a school from sharing a student's personally identifiable information relative to illness or disease with the Dept. of Health for purposes of the Sanitary Code or any other purpose without parental consent (Item #42)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-19 - House - House Vote on HB 82 HEALTH AND WELFARE (#165) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19HouseRead by title, amended, by a vote of 59 yeas, 33 nays, the bill was recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-10-19HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-10-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/19/20.
2020-10-15HouseNotice given.
2020-10-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-10-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
2020-10-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-14HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-10-05HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback