LA HB819 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana for additional conditions and allows any state-licensed physician to recommend medical marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana for additional conditions and allows any state-licensed physician to recommend medical marijuana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 819 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#663) (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 819 FINAL PASSAGE (#391) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 819 FINAL PASSAGE (#160) (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 286.
2020-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 74, nays 16, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-27SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-20SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB819&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168097
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169717
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178460
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182363
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169155
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169414
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169690
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175008
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176736
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178263
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1168098
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169861
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176565

Bill Comments

feedback