LA HB818 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-31 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-31 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to high net worth insureds (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Title
Provides relative to high net worth insureds (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#576) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (10-1-1). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |