LA HB816 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Port of South Louisiana
Title
Provides relative to the Port of South Louisiana
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (15-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |