LA HB802 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to digital assets
Title
Provides relative to digital assets
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 802 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1385) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 802 FINAL PASSAGE (#1115) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 802 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 802 FINAL PASSAGE (#1115) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 802 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 509. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |