LA HB800 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the secretary of the Department of Revenue to disclose certain taxpayer information to the state treasurer (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the secretary of the Department of Revenue to disclose certain taxpayer information to the state treasurer (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 800 FINAL PASSAGE (#922) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 800 FINAL PASSAGE (#473) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 800 FINAL PASSAGE (#473) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 339. |
2018-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |