LA HB80 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts spending of state general fund revenue-direct to 98% of the official forecast (EG -$218,100,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Restricts spending of state general fund revenue-direct to 98% of the official forecast (EG -$218,100,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 80 FINAL PASSAGE (#606) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 80 AMENDMENT # 3705 BY IVEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#605) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 80 AMENDMENT # 3705 BY IVEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#605) (Y: 18 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-15 | House | Prefiled. |