LA HB797 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-21 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-21 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a quarterly report to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget regarding contracts let in the construction of the University Medical Center in New Orleans (EG GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for a quarterly report to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget regarding contracts let in the construction of the University Medical Center in New Orleans (EG GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Notice removed. | |
2012-05-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |
2012-05-15 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-15 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported with amendments (20-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |