LA HB77 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the suspension or deferral of sentence and probation in felony cases (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the suspension or deferral of sentence and probation in felony cases (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#492) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 61.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-12HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
2021-03-09HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-08HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB77&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1202707
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217710
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228882
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231934
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1202717
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217543
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218131
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217984
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231902
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237447
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220693
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228479

Bill Comments

feedback