LA HB769 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Shreveport Implementation and Redevelopment Authority (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Creates the Shreveport Implementation and Redevelopment Authority (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Burrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 769 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1126) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 769 ADOPT (#1105) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 769 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#988) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 769 FINAL PASSAGE (#784) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 769 FINAL PASSAGE (#166) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 769 ADOPT (#1105) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 769 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#988) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 769 FINAL PASSAGE (#784) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 769 FINAL PASSAGE (#166) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 432. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee and concurred in the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House reconsidered Senate amendments. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reconsidered. |
2015-06-11 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice Senate recommitted to the Conference Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice Senate failed to adopt Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 12 yeas and 22 nays. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of change in House conferee: Norton replaces Carmody |
2015-06-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Burrell, Badon, and Carmody. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Tarver, Buffington, and Peacock. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |