LA HB762 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 06/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 06/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for the Louisiana Outdoors Forever Program (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for the Louisiana Outdoors Forever Program (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 762 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1307) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 762 FINAL PASSAGE (#995) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 762 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 762 FINAL PASSAGE (#995) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 762 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | House | Effective date: 06/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 714. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/2/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |