LA HB761 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Becomes HB 1157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Becomes HB 1157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Medicaid recovery audit contractor program (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to the Medicaid recovery audit contractor program (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Becomes HB 1157. |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported by substitute (12-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |