LA HB761 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an urban agriculture incentive zone

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an urban agriculture incentive zone

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 761 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#984) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 761 FINAL PASSAGE (#880) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 761 FINAL PASSAGE (#659) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-07-01HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 429.
2015-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-09HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2015-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
2015-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-06-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-06-04SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-06-02SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2015-06-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
2015-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2015-06-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-01HouseRules suspended.
2015-06-01HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2015-04-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2015-04-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB761&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=937363
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953289
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954436
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958251
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960492
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952957
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948228
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953212
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953427
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955629
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957603
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958103
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=937366
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953377
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955787
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=963919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954410
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956522

Bill Comments

feedback