LA HB76 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Electric Line Worker" specialty license plate
Title
Creates the "Electric Line Worker" specialty license plate
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#1023) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2022. |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-02-18 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. |
2022-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |