LA HB748 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to imported seafood safety fees (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to imported seafood safety fees (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 748 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1666) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#1322) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#367) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#1322) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 748 FINAL PASSAGE (#367) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-25 | House | Becomes Act No. 787 without the Governor's signature. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 22. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |