LA HB745 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the officer bill of rights
Title
Provides relative to the officer bill of rights
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Green [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 745 FINAL PASSAGE (#1116) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 745 FINAL PASSAGE (#1022) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 745 FINAL PASSAGE (#1022) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 634. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/2/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | hb921 |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |