LA HB743 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Revenue Sharing Distribution for Fiscal Year 2018-2019
Title
Provides for Revenue Sharing Distribution for Fiscal Year 2018-2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 743 FINAL PASSAGE (#1156) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 743 FINAL PASSAGE (#635) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 743 FINAL PASSAGE (#635) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 396. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-25 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 5 for 04/30/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |