LA HB730 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts the Interstate Corrections Compact in Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopts the Interstate Corrections Compact in Louisiana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 730 FINAL PASSAGE (#1092) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 730 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 730 FINAL PASSAGE (#573) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 440.
2018-05-17HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-14SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-10SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-05HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2018-03-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-03-26HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB730&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078938
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083471
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087433
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096647
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101329
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086994
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087396
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078939
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087585
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105663
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090152
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103773

Bill Comments

feedback