LA HB73 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the La. Department of Health to contract for the administration of the Medicaid estate recovery program (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes the La. Department of Health to contract for the administration of the Medicaid estate recovery program (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 73 FINAL PASSAGE (#190) (Y: 48 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 47. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-12 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021. |
2021-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-08 | House | Prefiled. |