LA HB729 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the release and dissemination of booking photographs of an arrested person
Title
Limits the release and dissemination of booking photographs of an arrested person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 729 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1699) (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 729 ADOPT (#1444) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 729 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1600) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 729 FINAL PASSAGE (#1277) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 729 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 729 ADOPT (#1444) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 729 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1600) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 729 FINAL PASSAGE (#1277) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 729 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 06/16/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 494. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 67, nays 27. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Reese, and Price. |
2022-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Duplessis, Marino, and Bacala. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 15, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |