LA HB716 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to sharing of student information with certain postsecondary education institutions conducting academic research
Title
Provides relative to sharing of student information with certain postsecondary education institutions conducting academic research
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 716 ADOPT (#1396) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 716 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1403) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 716 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1154) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 716 FINAL PASSAGE (#921) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 716 AMENDMENT # 3860 BY CLAITOR HB 716 BY LEGER (#920) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 716 FINAL PASSAGE (#291) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 716 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1403) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 716 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1154) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 716 FINAL PASSAGE (#921) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 716 AMENDMENT # 3860 BY CLAITOR HB 716 BY LEGER (#920) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 716 FINAL PASSAGE (#291) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 691. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, Appel, and Bishop. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Leger, Nancy Landry, and Thomas. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-16 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |