LA HB713 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds licensed athletic trainer under the medical malpractice act
Title
Adds licensed athletic trainer under the medical malpractice act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 713 FINAL PASSAGE (#347) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |