LA HB711 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date: January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date: January 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the requirements of the notice of candidacy by additionally requiring a candidate for major or district office to certify that he has filed any campaign finance reports previously due and provides for the filing of vacancies on parish executive committees
Title
Provides for the requirements of the notice of candidacy by additionally requiring a candidate for major or district office to certify that he has filed any campaign finance reports previously due and provides for the filing of vacancies on parish executive committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 711, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1485) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 711, FINAL PASSAGE (#1478) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 711, FINAL PASSAGE (#695) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 711, FINAL PASSAGE (#1478) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 711, FINAL PASSAGE (#695) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Effective date: January 1, 2013. | |
2012-06-12 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 758. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-29 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-28 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-24 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |