LA HB707 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 42 yeas, 57 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - By a vote of 42 yeas, 57 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the expungement of criminal records (RR1 +$3,049,816 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the expungement of criminal records (RR1 +$3,049,816 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 707 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1518) (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 707 FINAL PASSAGE (#1066) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 707 AMENDMENT # 4939 BY FONTENOT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1065) (Y: 46 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 707 FINAL PASSAGE (#1066) (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 707 AMENDMENT # 4939 BY FONTENOT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1065) (Y: 46 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 42 yeas, 57 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |