LA HB707 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB480

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to employment discrimination (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to employment discrimination (EN NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 707 FINAL PASSAGE (#914) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 707 FINAL PASSAGE (#480) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 406.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-19SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 480 reported by the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (11-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB480 (Replaces) 2021-05-10 - Becomes HB 707.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB707&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222189
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222492
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225412
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233063
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235804
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222190
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222760
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225078
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225464
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227098
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225367
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232708

Bill Comments

feedback