LA HB706 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB343
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to microwineries
Title
Provides relative to microwineries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 706 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1025) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706 FINAL PASSAGE (#762) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 706 FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706 FINAL PASSAGE (#762) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 706 FINAL PASSAGE (#479) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 380. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021. |
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 343 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (9-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB343 (Replaces) 2021-05-10 - Becomes HB 706.