LA HB706 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to application to the La. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation for coverage
Title
Provides relative to application to the La. Citizens Property Insurance Corporation for coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 706, MOTION TO ADOPT (#2001) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706, ADOPT (#2081) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 706, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1886) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#1870) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#514) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706, ADOPT (#2081) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 706, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1886) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#1870) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#514) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1023. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee report received. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hebert, Riser, and Morrell. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-20 | House conferees appointed: Abramson, Kleckley, and Talbot. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-18 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-18 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-04 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported with amendments (7-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |