LA HB703 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to unemployment compensation requirements
Title
Provides relative to unemployment compensation requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 703 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (10-5). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |