LA HB70 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 07/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extends Enterprise Zone Program incentives to essential critical infrastructure workers by authorizing the payment of a one-time hazard pay rebate (Item #18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends Enterprise Zone Program incentives to essential critical infrastructure workers by authorizing the payment of a one-time hazard pay rebate (Item #18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Sponsors

Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]
Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]
Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]
Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]
Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]
Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]
Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]
Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]
Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]
Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]
Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]
Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 70 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#150) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 70 CO-AUTHORS (#133) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#79) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseEffective date: 07/13/2020.
2020-07-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 12.
2020-06-29HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20.
2020-06-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-25SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-24SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-18HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-17HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-06-16HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-06-15HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB70&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182223
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182710
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183003
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184798
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185794
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182579
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182623
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182968
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183794
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184366
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184505
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184649
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184756
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182568
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182779
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183019
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183110
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183924
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184412

Bill Comments

feedback