LA HB7 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Effective date: March 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the parcel fee imposed within the Seabrook Neighborhood Improvement and Security District in Orleans Parish (Item #5) (EN +$280,000 LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the parcel fee imposed within the Seabrook Neighborhood Improvement and Security District in Orleans Parish (Item #5) (EN +$280,000 LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#59) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#27) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03HouseEffective date: March 3, 2017.
2017-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
2017-02-22HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-02-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-02-22SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-02-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-02-21SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-02-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2017-02-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-02-19HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-02-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17.
2017-02-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-02-17HouseRules suspended.
2017-02-17HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2017-02-13HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=171ES&b=HB7&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021524
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022067
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022814
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1023420
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021525
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021825
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022250
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022457
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022885
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022790

Bill Comments

feedback