LA HB7 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Effective date: 03/03/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Effective date: 03/03/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to corporate income exclusions for dividend income from certain banking institutions (Item #15) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to corporate income exclusions for dividend income from certain banking institutions (Item #15) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#31) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | Effective date: 03/03/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1. |
2016-03-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). |
2016-02-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-02-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-02-12 | House | Prefiled. |