LA HB699 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB524

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the decriminalization and regulation of marijuana for recreational purposes (EG GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the decriminalization and regulation of marijuana for recreational purposes (EG GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseNotice removed
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
2021-05-11HouseNotice given.
2021-05-11HouseNotice removed
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
2021-05-10HouseNotice given.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-10HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
2021-05-04HouseNotice given.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-05-03HouseNotice given.
2021-05-03HouseRules suspended.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 524 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (7-5).

Same As/Similar To

HB524 (Replaces) 2021-04-28 - Becomes HB 699.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB699&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218207
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218287
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218818
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220125
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217856
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220400
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222471
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225365
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218329
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220473

Bill Comments

feedback