LA HB697 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reforms the state systems for regulating the production of marijuana for therapeutic use and for the dispensing of such product (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Reforms the state systems for regulating the production of marijuana for therapeutic use and for the dispensing of such product (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 697 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1551) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#1223) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 AMENDMENT # 3682 BY LUNEAU HB 697 BY MAGEE (#1222) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#1223) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 AMENDMENT # 3682 BY LUNEAU HB 697 BY MAGEE (#1222) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 491. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 17, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |