LA HB693 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dedicates a portion of the avails of state sales and use tax to the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund and extends .4% of current state sales and use tax (EG -$37,800,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Dedicates a portion of the avails of state sales and use tax to the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund and extends .4% of current state sales and use tax (EG -$37,800,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |