LA HB69 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Louisiana Agricultural Workforce Development Program" (Item #67)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "Louisiana Agricultural Workforce Development Program" (Item #67)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#123) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseEffective date: 10/28/2020.
2020-10-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 23.
2020-10-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-22HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-10-22SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-21SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-14SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-10-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20.
2020-10-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-12HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB69&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190027
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191827
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192591
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194202
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194939
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190947
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191796
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192224
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190028
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191961
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192724
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1196797
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192577
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194144

Bill Comments

feedback