LA HB688 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 58. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 58. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to sabbatical leave for teachers
Title
Provides relative to sabbatical leave for teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 688 FINAL PASSAGE (#782) (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 58. Failed to pass. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |