LA HB687 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposition of funds derived from alternative energy production in the coastal area (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Relative to the disposition of funds derived from alternative energy production in the coastal area (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 687 FINAL PASSAGE (#379) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2022. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |