LA HB687 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restructuring of hunting and fishing licenses (EG INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Restructuring of hunting and fishing licenses (EG INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 687 FINAL PASSAGE (#545) (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-04-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported with amendments (12-3-1). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |