LA HB682 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a claims adjuster database (EN +$122,000 SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for a claims adjuster database (EN +$122,000 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Brown [D] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Sen. Jeremy Stine [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 682 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1249) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#937) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#937) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2023. |
2022-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |