LA HB681 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the description of a capital improvement project for the SOWELA Technical Community College to be financed through the sale of bonds (EG1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Changes the description of a capital improvement project for the SOWELA Technical Community College to be financed through the sale of bonds (EG1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 681 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#975) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#780) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#551) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#780) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#551) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: July 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |