LA HB678 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Designates a roadway as the "Francis E. 'Hank' Lauricella Memorial Road"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a roadway as the "Francis E. 'Hank' Lauricella Memorial Road"

Sponsors

Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]
Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]
Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]
Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]
Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]
Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]
Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]
Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Edward Price [D]
Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 678 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1123) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#770) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote on HB 678 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: See Act.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 460.
2018-05-17HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-07SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-02SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-03-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/15/18.
2018-03-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-13HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB678&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073248
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074463
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097588
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101817
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090337
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092341
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097099
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097527
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073255
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074588
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1108463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075590
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093850

Bill Comments

feedback