LA HB67 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exception to the crime of illegal carrying of weapons for certain persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an exception to the crime of illegal carrying of weapons for certain persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#884) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 67 AMENDMENT # 3448 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#638) (Y: 33 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#640) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 67 AMENDMENT # 3449 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#639) (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23HouseEffective date: 08/01/2024.
2024-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 189.
2024-05-21HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2024-05-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2024-05-20HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2024-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2024-05-16SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2024-05-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2024-05-01SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2024-04-30SenateReported favorably.
2024-04-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2024-04-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2024-04-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2024-04-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2024.
2024-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-04-16HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2024-03-11HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2024-02-09HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024.
2024-02-07HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2024-02-07HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=24rs&b=HB67&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1342487
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1365948
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367902
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375798
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1379491
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1356233
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1365868
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367103
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367557
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367556
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1342489
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1366183
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367959
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1385744
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367801
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367863
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1367864
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1375596

Bill Comments

feedback