LA HB668 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 66 yeas, 21 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 66 yeas, 21 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to credit unions
Title
Provides relative to credit unions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 668 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1706) (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 668 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1706) (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 668 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1508) (Y: 37 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 668 FINAL PASSAGE (#642) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 668 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1706) (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 668 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1508) (Y: 37 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 668 FINAL PASSAGE (#642) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | By a vote of 66 yeas, 21 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | House | By a vote of 37 yeas, 65 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |