LA HB661 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to drug paraphernalia
Title
Provides relative to drug paraphernalia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#1298) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 3859 BY MORRELL HB 661 BY JAMES (#1297) (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#286) (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 2396 BY MARINO MOTION TO ADOPT (#285) (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 2392 BY BACALA MOTION TO ADOPT (#284) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 3859 BY MORRELL HB 661 BY JAMES (#1297) (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#286) (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 2396 BY MARINO MOTION TO ADOPT (#285) (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 661 AMENDMENT # 2392 BY BACALA MOTION TO ADOPT (#284) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 15 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (11-2). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |